NY A04789 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state interagency coordinating council for service-disabled veterans; defines the powers and duties of the council and requires an annual report by the council to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Title
Establishes the New York state interagency coordinating council for service-disabled veterans; defines the powers and duties of the council and requires an annual report by the council to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.538 |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4789a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.189 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.256 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04362 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS