NY A04784 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to restrictions on a sex offender's custody of or visitation with a child.
Title
Relates to restrictions on a sex offender's custody of or visitation with a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.182 |
2019-08-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.589 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a4784c |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1760 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 2836C |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 2836B |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 2836A |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s2836c |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.589 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.589 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | print number 4784c |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 4784b |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | print number 4784a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02836 (Same As) 2019-08-22 - SIGNED CHAP.182