NY A04781 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - signed chap.379
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires pharmacies to make reasonable attempts to notify patients within seven days by phone or mail of class I drug recalls where such patients are currently taking such recalled drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires pharmacies to make reasonable attempts to notify patients within seven days by phone or mail of class I drug recalls where such patients are currently taking such recalled drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-18Senatesigned chap.379
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1252
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5091B
2019-05-30SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.413
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-08Assemblyprint number 4781b
2019-05-08Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2019-04-12Assemblyprint number 4781a
2019-04-12Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S05091 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4781B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04781&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04781&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04781
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04781&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04781A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04781&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04781B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04781&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04781&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4781#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback