NY A04775 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional information required in annual reports for limited-profit housing companies.
Title
Relates to additional information required in annual reports for limited-profit housing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.340 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.211 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S00625 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES