NY A04762 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the farmworkers fair labor practices act: grants collective bargaining rights to farm laborers; requires employers of farm laborers to allow at least 24 consecutive hours of rest each week; provides for an 8 hour work day for farm laborers; requires overtime rate at one and one-half times normal rate; makes provisions of unemployment insurance law applicable to farm laborers; provides sanitary code shall apply to all farm and food processing labor camps intended to house migrant workers, regardless of the number of occupants; provides for eligibility of farm laborers for workers' compensation benefits; requires employers of farm laborers to provide such farm laborers with claim forms for workers' compensation claims under certain conditions; requires reporting of injuries to employers of farmworkers.
Title
Enacts the farmworkers fair labor practices act: grants collective bargaining rights to farm laborers; requires employers of farm laborers to allow at least 24 consecutive hours of rest each week; provides for an 8 hour work day for farm laborers; requires overtime rate at one and one-half times normal rate; makes provisions of unemployment insurance law applicable to farm laborers; provides sanitary code shall apply to all farm and food processing labor camps intended to house migrant workers, regardless of the number of occupants; provides for eligibility of farm laborers for workers' compensation benefits; requires employers of farm laborers to provide such farm laborers with claim forms for workers' compensation claims under certain conditions; requires reporting of injuries to employers of farmworkers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01291 (Same As) 2016-05-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE