NY A04761 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - print number 4761b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - print number 4761b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for the sale of the first $35,000 for a battery, electric, or plug-in hybrid electric vehicle from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to elect such incentives; repeals the hybrid exemption after ten years.
Title
Provides an exemption for the sale of the first $35,000 for a battery, electric, or plug-in hybrid electric vehicle from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to elect such incentives; repeals the hybrid exemption after ten years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Assembly | print number 4761b |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | print number 4761a |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04476 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE