NY A04759 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-25 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-25 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensure of mold assessment and remediation specialists.
Title
Relates to the licensure of mold assessment and remediation specialists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.90 |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-05-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3674 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.255 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03674 (Same As) 2015-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4759