NY A04753 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the Thousand Islands - Seaway Wine Trail to include the White Caps Winery and the Cape Winery.
Title
Relates to extending the Thousand Islands - Seaway Wine Trail to include the White Caps Winery and the Cape Winery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s2241 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.553 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02241 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.283