NY A04752 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires assessors using the comparable sales method for assessments to consider certain comparable properties in formulating the assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires assessors using the comparable sales method for assessments to consider certain comparable properties in formulating the assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.803
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5674
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.506
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 4752b
2019-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-25Assemblyprint number 4752a
2019-04-25Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to real property taxation
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S05674 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4752B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04752
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04752A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04752B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback