NY A04747 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the village of Westbury retroactive real property tax exempt status for property located at 255 Schenck Avenue, village of Westbury, town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau.
Title
Grants the village of Westbury retroactive real property tax exempt status for property located at 255 Schenck Avenue, village of Westbury, town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.348 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.259 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a4747a |
2019-05-13 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.571 |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4362A |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4362a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.259 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.259 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | print number 4747a |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04362 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.348