NY A04738 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents; provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents; provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.

Sponsors

Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. David Gantt [D]
Asm. Dov Hikind [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Sen. Shelley Mayer [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D]
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Rafael Espinal [D]
Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]
Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Frank Skartados [D]

Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.946
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-04-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-02-02Assemblyprint number 4738a
2018-02-02Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2018-01-09Assemblycommitted to health
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.338
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2017-05-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-16Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.341
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-03-01Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-02-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-02-03Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04371 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04840 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 4840A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04738
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04738A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC5
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04738&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC6

Bill Comments

feedback