NY A04737 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds medical and health insurance information within the definitions of identity theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds medical and health insurance information within the definitions of identity theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-14Senate3RD READING CAL.731
2024-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2376B
2024-04-15SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2024-04-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-04-15Assemblypassed assembly
2024-04-12Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.405
2024-04-09Assemblyreported
2024-04-05Assemblyprint number 4737b
2024-04-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2024-03-15Assemblyprint number 4737a
2024-03-15Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-02-23Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02376 (Same As) 2024-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4737B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4737
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04737&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04737
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04737&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04737A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04737&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04737B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04737&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04737&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4737#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback