NY A04737 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-7)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Title
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.208 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-29 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.410 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | substituted for a4737 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.423 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | substituted by s1674 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.410 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01674 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.208