NY A04733 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - print number 4733a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - print number 4733a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation.
Title
Relates to the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Assembly | print number 4733a |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03931 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3931A