NY A04723 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the passage of bills by the legislature between the hours of midnight and eight o'clock a.m. unless 2/3 of the legislature is present; requires two-thirds approval for messages of necessity.
Title
Prohibits the passage of bills by the legislature between the hours of midnight and eight o'clock a.m. unless 2/3 of the legislature is present; requires two-thirds approval for messages of necessity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00048 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY