NY A04696 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York State fair pay act"; provides that it shall be an unlawful employment practice for an employer to discriminate between employees on the basis of sex, race and/or national origin by paying different wages.
Title
Enacts the "New York State fair pay act"; provides that it shall be an unlawful employment practice for an employer to discriminate between employees on the basis of sex, race and/or national origin by paying different wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.334 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.36 |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.36 |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04482 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR