NY A04686 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases the number of signatures for independent nominating petitions of candidates for public office; now 2.5%.
Title
Decreases the number of signatures for independent nominating petitions of candidates for public office; now 2.5%.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Assembly | signed chap.90 |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.313 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4380 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.21 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.21 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04380 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4686