NY A04679 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division for small-business to examine and report on the establishment of new financial products for the benefit of small businesses in emerging domestic markets.
Title
Directs the division for small-business to examine and report on the establishment of new financial products for the benefit of small businesses in emerging domestic markets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2011-02-04 | Assembly | referred to small business |