NY A04663 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-17 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-17 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions related to imposing a pass-through entity tax.
Title
Establishes provisions related to imposing a pass-through entity tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-04-01 | Assembly | print number 4663c |
2021-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | print number 4663b |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | print number 4663a |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03186 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE