NY A04656 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a special needs assisted living program to serve persons with neurodegenerative diseases, such as dementia or Parkinson's disease, who are experiencing behavior disturbances.
Title
Establishes a special needs assisted living program to serve persons with neurodegenerative diseases, such as dementia or Parkinson's disease, who are experiencing behavior disturbances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 4656b |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 4656a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04546 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE