NY A04654 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on active duty to receive high school diplomas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on active duty to receive high school diplomas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-08Assemblyprint number 4654a
2019-05-08Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S01660 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1660A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback