NY A04647 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Entitles members to bring one statewide piece of legislation of his or her choosing to the floor for a vote without a home rule message and committee review during each two-year term.
Title
Entitles members to bring one statewide piece of legislation of his or her choosing to the floor for a vote without a home rule message and committee review during each two-year term.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | print number 4647a |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03965 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS