NY A04643 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes the removal of pension and retirement benefits from persons convicted of certain felonies.
Title
Proposes the removal of pension and retirement benefits from persons convicted of certain felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | print number 4643a |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |