NY A04637 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - approval memo.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - approval memo.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the exceptions to certain effluent limitations in Nassau and Suffolk counties and requires certain eligible projects for state aid involving water pollution control revolving fund agreements to take county-wide or regional wastewater planning into consideration when determining eligibility; requires best available technology to be used to reduce nitrogen pollution.
Title
Limits the exceptions to certain effluent limitations in Nassau and Suffolk counties and requires certain eligible projects for state aid involving water pollution control revolving fund agreements to take county-wide or regional wastewater planning into consideration when determining eligibility; requires best available technology to be used to reduce nitrogen pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Assembly | approval memo.156 |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | signed chap.807 |
2021-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1744 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5022 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.550 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05022 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4637