NY A04623 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a New York state legend on all bell jar tickets sold in New York state.
Title
Requires a New York state legend on all bell jar tickets sold in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-25 | Senate | vetoed memo.152 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1188 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4587 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.116 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S04587 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - tabled