NY A04619 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - advanced to third reading cal.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - advanced to third reading cal.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a private right of action for improper debt collection procedures; allows plaintiffs to recover punitive damages and reasonable attorneys' fees.
Title
Creates a private right of action for improper debt collection procedures; allows plaintiffs to recover punitive damages and reasonable attorneys' fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.418 |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.197 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02444 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION