NY A04608 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s4598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s4598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Copiague Fire District to file an application for exemption from 2020-2021 real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the Copiague Fire District to file an application for exemption from 2020-2021 real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4598 |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.532 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04598 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.314