NY A04603 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to polystyrene waste reduction; prohibits the use of polystyrene foam by contractors and lessees who deal with the state through state and municipal contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to polystyrene waste reduction; prohibits the use of polystyrene foam by contractors and lessees who deal with the state through state and municipal contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-13Assemblyprint number 4603a
2019-05-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S03069 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3069B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback