NY A04602 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for medical assistance to address growth and development problems in children as a result of various illnesses, conditions, diseases or injuries.
Title
Provides for medical assistance to address growth and development problems in children as a result of various illnesses, conditions, diseases or injuries.
Sponsors
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Janet Duprey [R] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | print number 4602a |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | referred to health |