NY A04600 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to annual reports of the boards of elections; requires such reports be made available on the boards' websites; requires that the reports include specific performance metrics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to annual reports of the boards of elections; requires such reports be made available on the boards' websites; requires that the reports include specific performance metrics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-27SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2014-01-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-01-27Assemblypassed assembly
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.209
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2013-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2013-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.217
2013-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.217
2013-06-12Assemblyreported
2013-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2013-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-02-06Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S04478 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback