NY A04598 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Title
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in housing |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | print number 4598a |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03630 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3630A