NY A04586 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - signed chap.494
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that lactation rooms in service areas which are maintained or operated by the New York state thruway authority shall display information for services related to human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that lactation rooms in service areas which are maintained or operated by the New York state thruway authority shall display information for services related to human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-27Assemblysigned chap.494
2023-09-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1848
2023-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5827
2023-03-27SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2023-03-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-03-27Assemblypassed assembly
2023-03-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.86
2023-03-21Assemblyreported
2023-02-17Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S05827 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4586

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback