NY A04572 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.375
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a tax check-off for gifts to food banks; establishes the gifts to food banks fund; authorizes and directs the commissioner of temporary and disability assistance to promulgate rules and regulations necessary to distribute grants to local not-for-profit corporations for the distribution of food to persons in need.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a tax check-off for gifts to food banks; establishes the gifts to food banks fund; authorizes and directs the commissioner of temporary and disability assistance to promulgate rules and regulations necessary to distribute grants to local not-for-profit corporations for the distribution of food to persons in need.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.375
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2129
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8938
2018-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.42
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.42
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-16Assemblyprint number 4572a
2018-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-02-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S08938 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4572A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04572&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04572&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04572
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04572&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04572A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04572&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04572&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04572&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4572#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback