NY A04570 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits commercial feed manufacturers to use the term "human food grade" for certain pet food if it conforms to certain state and federal standards.
Title
Permits commercial feed manufacturers to use the term "human food grade" for certain pet food if it conforms to certain state and federal standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | vetoed memo.101 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1637 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3212A |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.398 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.398 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 4570a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S03212 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4570A