NY A04570 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of benthic barriers, between July 1 and October 31, to control invasive aquatic plants around docks.
Title
Authorizes the use of benthic barriers, between July 1 and October 31, to control invasive aquatic plants around docks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00894 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05413 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S05413 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION