NY A04568 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the sale or use of nitrogen fertilizer; prohibits the sale or use of fertilizer in Nassau or Suffolk counties other than low nitrogen fertilizer; requires the department of environmental conservation to report to the governor and legislature regarding expanding the prohibition to other areas of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the sale or use of nitrogen fertilizer; prohibits the sale or use of fertilizer in Nassau or Suffolk counties other than low nitrogen fertilizer; requires the department of environmental conservation to report to the governor and legislature regarding expanding the prohibition to other areas of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.157
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02130 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback