NY A04558 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes courts to hold evidentiary hearings for a temporary order of protection in certain circumstances and grants superior court judges the authority to issue a temporary order of protection when an action is pending in a local criminal court in certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes courts to hold evidentiary hearings for a temporary order of protection in certain circumstances and grants superior court judges the authority to issue a temporary order of protection when an action is pending in a local criminal court in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | print number 4558b |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | print number 4558a |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02832 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES