NY A04535 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of financial services to conduct a review of the classification used by authorized insurers in this state issuing auto insurance coverage for commuter vans, ambulette or paratransit vehicles, including coverage in the assigned risk plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires the superintendent of financial services to conduct a review of the classification used by authorized insurers in this state issuing auto insurance coverage for commuter vans, ambulette or paratransit vehicles, including coverage in the assigned risk plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.50 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1926 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4155A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.522 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.522 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 4535a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04155 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4535A