NY A04532 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office of addiction services and supports, in consultation with the director of the state office for the aging, to develop comprehensive substance use disorder prevention, education and treatment demonstration programs for senior citizens.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office of addiction services and supports, in consultation with the director of the state office for the aging, to develop comprehensive substance use disorder prevention, education and treatment demonstration programs for senior citizens.
Sponsors
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 4532a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |