NY A04520 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the posting of notice by certain establishments upon the submission of an application or application for renewal for a liquor license to sell liquor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the posting of notice by certain establishments upon the submission of an application or application for renewal for a liquor license to sell liquor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s2359
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.503
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S02359 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.71

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback