NY A04516 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits clauses in residential leases requiring the declawing of animals; provides that any person, firm or corporation who violates such provisions is guilty of a violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits clauses in residential leases requiring the declawing of animals; provides that any person, firm or corporation who violates such provisions is guilty of a violation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.295
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback