NY A04489 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - advanced to third reading cal.537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - advanced to third reading cal.537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits participation in torture and improper treatment of prisoners by health care professionals; prohibits a health care professional from engaging, assisting, planning the torture or improper treatment of a prisoner; requires health care professionals to report torture and improper treatment.
Title
Prohibits participation in torture and improper treatment of prisoners by health care professionals; prohibits a health care professional from engaging, assisting, planning the torture or improper treatment of a prisoner; requires health care professionals to report torture and improper treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.537 |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00105 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH