NY A04484 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - print number 4484a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - print number 4484a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes incapacity to consent when a person is a witness to or subject of an investigation under certain circumstances.
Title
Establishes incapacity to consent when a person is a witness to or subject of an investigation under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | print number 4484a |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02153 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 2153A