NY A04481 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-24 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

To set forth requirements and guidelines for the Bilingual Teachers of Tomorrow Recruitment and Retention Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act to amend the education law, in relation to establishing the bilingual teachers of tomorrow teacher recruitment and retention program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-24 held for consideration in education
2010-01-06 referred to education
2009-02-04 referred to education

Same As/Similar To

S2543 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback