NY A04474 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.729
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.729
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating an action for the recovery of damages for personal injury caused by exposure to toxic burn pits while serving as a member of the armed forces on or after August 2, 1990.
Title
Relates to creating an action for the recovery of damages for personal injury caused by exposure to toxic burn pits while serving as a member of the armed forces on or after August 2, 1990.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.729 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1790 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6656A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.311 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.311 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 4474a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06656 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4474A