NY A04467 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - signed chap.76
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - signed chap.76
Summary
To provide the authority for enrolled students at least 17 years of age, upon consent from their school district and parents (or legal guardians), to serve as election inspectors and poll clerks during elections.
Title
Permits certain students enrolled in school, with parental consent, to serve as election inspectors or poll clerks at elections under the election or education law; such students, if so serving while school is in session, shall be recorded as in attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | signed chap.76 | |
2010-04-30 | delivered to governor | |
2010-04-26 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-04-26 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-03-08 | 3RD READING CAL.190 | |
2010-03-08 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5172A | |
2010-01-26 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-01-26 | delivered to senate | |
2010-01-26 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-12 | amended on third reading 4467a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.332 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-16 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-03-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-16 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-26 | advanced to third reading cal.165 | |
2009-02-25 | reported | |
2009-02-04 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S5172-A (Same As) 2010-03-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4467A
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04467&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |