NY A04466 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain prohibitions in contracts or agreements by health maintenance organizations; prohibits clauses which entitle reimbursement at the lowest price or rate; prohibits contracts which restrict referral of patients based solely upon a health care provider's status with a managed care product; prohibits disclosure of an enrollee's diagnosis on a prescription as a condition for authorizing coverage for payment or dispensing of a prescription; and prohibits contracts which allow for the substitution of a pharmaceutical drug or agent by any person other than the prescribing health care professional.
Title
Relates to certain prohibitions in contracts or agreements by health maintenance organizations; prohibits clauses which entitle reimbursement at the lowest price or rate; prohibits contracts which restrict referral of patients based solely upon a health care provider's status with a managed care product; prohibits disclosure of an enrollee's diagnosis on a prescription as a condition for authorizing coverage for payment or dispensing of a prescription; and prohibits contracts which allow for the substitution of a pharmaceutical drug or agent by any person other than the prescribing health care professional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.203 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4466a |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.49 |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |