NY A04464 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lottery sales agents to return previously purchased lottery tickets to the persons submitting them to such agents for verification of prizes won or lost; requires lottery ticket dispensing machines used for verifying if a ticket is a winner or not to return the ticket submitted for verification.
Title
Requires lottery sales agents to return previously purchased lottery tickets to the persons submitting them to such agents for verification of prizes won or lost; requires lottery ticket dispensing machines used for verifying if a ticket is a winner or not to return the ticket submitted for verification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.424 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |