NY A04460 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8959
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8959
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transfer of retirement membership for certain employees of SUNY within the professional, scientific and technical bargaining unit.
Title
Relates to transfer of retirement membership for certain employees of SUNY within the professional, scientific and technical bargaining unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8959 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.680 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | print number 4460a |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08959 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.137