NY A04453 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer real property from the St. Lawrence psychiatric center to the city of Ogdensburg.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer real property from the St. Lawrence psychiatric center to the city of Ogdensburg.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 4453a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06080 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT